U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00408-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Suaste et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • January 04, 2023: [Petition and Order]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Summons]
  • October 31, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.