U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00416-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zuniga et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.