U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00406-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.