U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00407-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garrard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Detention]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.