U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00409-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Gutierrez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 18, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2023: [Joinder]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 31, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 30, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.