U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nunez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.