U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 07, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.