U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00426-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holmes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.