U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00428-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ravelo-Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 10, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.