U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mendenhall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 09, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.