U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00340-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Austin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 10, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.