U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00443-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Espinoza et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • November 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 17, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 17, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.