U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Petition and Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.