U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00446-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herrera-Yanez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • December 13, 2022: [Review of Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 27, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • November 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.