U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00444-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Turner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Petition and Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.