U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lemon et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order Regarding Travel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Regarding Travel]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 15, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [Discovery]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • November 29, 2022: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.