U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00453-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ekstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 20, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.