U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:97-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fox
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Unseal Document]
  • January 09, 2023: [Writ Issued]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Writ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.