U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00481-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bawden et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Dismissal]
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Dismissal per Rule 48(a)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 27, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 24, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 10, 2023: [Brady Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 19, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 19, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 16, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • December 16, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.