U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00468-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acosta et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Review of Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 13, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.