U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00495-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilcken
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Withdraw as Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 27, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.