U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tellez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 11, 2023: [Petition and Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Brady Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 15, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.