U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plastic Surgery Institute of Utah, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [In Limine]
  • March 27, 2025: [In Limine]
November, 2024
  • November 22, 2024: [Speedy Trial]
  • November 20, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 08, 2024: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • January 17, 2023: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.