U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Arriazola et al v. Management & Training Corp.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Settlement]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Settlement]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 08, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.