U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cv-00089
  • Case Name: Diamond G Rodeos et al v. Gifford
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 04, 2024: [Stay]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 04, 2024: [Memorandum Decision]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • October 03, 2024: [Memorandum Decision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.