U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00072
  • Case Name: N. v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 12, 2025: [Extension of Time]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.