U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Trial Order]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Continue]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.