U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00434
  • Case Name: Pilkington v. Gorsuch, LTD.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 08, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2024: [Dismiss]
  • October 04, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.