U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00704
  • Case Name: MJW Investments et al v. SentryWest Insurance Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.