U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00751
  • Case Name: Szymakowski v. Utah High School Activities Association et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2024
  • December 10, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Short Form Discovery]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Recusal]
  • October 07, 2024: [Expedite]
  • October 07, 2024: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Preliminary Injunction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.