U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gruber et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.