U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00048
  • Case Name: State of Utah et al v. Haaland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Administrative Appeal Scheduling Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 09, 2024: [Stay]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • October 07, 2024: [Intervene]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.