U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00326
  • Case Name: Origins Tech, Inc v. Oak Equity Holdings II LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • April 07, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Amended Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery]
  • March 31, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Extension of Time]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 08, 2024: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.