U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00747
  • Case Name: Cricut Inc v. Shanghai Sishun E-commerce Co Ltd et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 11, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 08, 2024: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.