U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00155
  • Case Name: Grant et al v. Kingston et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 04, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Conference]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 27, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • March 11, 2025: [Extension of Time to Amend]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 08, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.