U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00115-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Venz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Petition and Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.