U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00242-8
  • Case Name: USA v. Trejo-Barahona et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Release Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
  • March 24, 2025: [U-ACT Ineligible Participant Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Speedy Trial]
October, 2024
  • October 23, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.