U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00736
  • Case Name: Thomas v. UTA P.D. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.