U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00645
  • Case Name: Russell et al v. Allstate Indemnity Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Amended Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Amended Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.