U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00790
  • Case Name: Ammerman et al v. Fisher et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Dismiss Party]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 14, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2024
  • December 09, 2024: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.