U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00528
  • Case Name: In re HealthEquity,Inc. Data Security Incident Litigation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 18, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 28, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • March 27, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2024
  • December 20, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.