U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cv-00091
  • Case Name: Broadbent et al v. Williams et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 24, 2025: [Leave to File Sealed Document]
  • April 24, 2025: [Disqualify Counsel]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • April 24, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 23, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 22, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for More Definite Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [More Definite Statement]
January, 2025
  • January 15, 2025: [Stay]
  • January 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.