U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00966
  • Case Name: Cruz v. Connexion Point LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 15, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 14, 2025: [Change Venue]
  • March 14, 2025: [File Excess Pages]
January, 2025
  • January 02, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.