U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castaneda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 14, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.