U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Petition and Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.