U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Blendtec v. Blendjet et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Strike]
  • April 29, 2025: [Clerks Entry of Default Certificate]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 09, 2025: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.