U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00180
  • Case Name: Charles Brown v. Wasatch Valley Pizza, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 21, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Change Venue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.