U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00344
  • Case Name: Wyssling v. Swensen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 28, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Sanctions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum Decision]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Sanctions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Default Judgment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Attorney Fees]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 11, 2025: [Withdraw as Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.