U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00215
  • Case Name: David v. Wasatch County Utah et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Short Form Discovery]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • March 11, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 10, 2025: [Short Form Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.