U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Kania v. Discover Bank Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Scheduling Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order to Propose Schedule]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 10, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.